TN HB1029 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires licensed motor vehicle dismantlers and recyclers to maintain records of each vehicle purchased for seven years rather than three. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 55 and Title 62, Chapter 9, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires licensed motor vehicle dismantlers and recyclers to maintain records of each vehicle purchased for seven years rather than three. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 55 and Title 62, Chapter 9, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1441 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1029&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1029.pdf |