TN HB1027 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, transfers the custody and care of the bust of Nathan Bedford Forrest held in the Tennessee State Museum to the Sons of Confederate Veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relative to the bust of Nathan Bedford Forrest in the Tennessee State Museum.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1097 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback