TN HB1021 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends deadline for applications for 2011-2012 annual events for five days after effective date of act. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, extends deadline for applications for 2011-2012 annual events for five days after effective date of act. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee of State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on s/c cal General Sub of S&LG for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2027 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1021&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1021.pdf |