TN HB1005 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases from 30 to 25 the number of days in which an agency must establish a hearing date and set the case on the docket after a written claim is filed by a person asserting a claim to property seized under a forfeiture warrant. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, relative to criminal procedure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1445 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee