TN HB0999 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-25)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, designates the bluetick coonhound as the official state dog. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, designates the bluetick coonhound as the official state dog. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.

Sponsors

Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]
Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Dale Carr [R]
Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]
Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. John DeBerry [D]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]
Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]
Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]
Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]
Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]
Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]
Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Rick Staples [D]
Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]
Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. John Windle [D]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01 Pub. Ch. 7
2019-04-01 Effective date(s) 03/20/2019
2019-03-20 Signed by Governor.
2019-03-13HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-03-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-07HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-02-28SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-02-28SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-02-28SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-26HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-02-25HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-02-21HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/25/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1129 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 7

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback