TN HB0996 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the department to utilize an enrollment-based child care subsidy payments program that complies with all applicable federal funding requirements and legal authority and that seeks to provide adequate, stable payments to providers of child care services by establishing effective payment practices based upon accurate time and attendance systems. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to child care.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 484 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1105 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021