TN HB0992 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of correction to pay all incarceration costs of a person held by a local law enforcement agency from the time of arrest for a parole violation until transferred into the custody of the department; provided, that the department shall not pay such costs for persons whose probation is reinstated. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of correction to pay all incarceration costs of a person held by a local law enforcement agency from the time of arrest for a parole violation until transferred into the custody of the department; provided, that the department shall not pay such costs for persons whose probation is reinstated. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0535 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0992&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0992.pdf |