TN HB0960 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a health insurance entity from taking certain actions with respect to coverage of prescription drugs outside of open enrollment periods. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a health insurance entity from taking certain actions with respect to coverage of prescription drugs outside of open enrollment periods. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0991 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee