TN HB0958 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows recognized minor party to remain recognized for four years; lowers signature requirement to become recognized minor party. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, allows recognized minor party to remain recognized for four years; lowers signature requirement to become recognized minor party. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2013-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to last calendar of 2014 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-02-07 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1091 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Failed In S. S&L Govt. Comm. Ayes 3, Nays 3 PNV 2