TN HB0948 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 399
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 399
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor offenses regarding drawing and filing of deeds without actual ownership of property. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 66.
Title
As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor offenses regarding drawing and filing of deeds without actual ownership of property. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Lollar [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 399 | |
2011-05-21 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-20 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/11/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0389 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 399