TN HB0946 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires compilation of an omnibus list of state programs by June 30, 2009. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires compilation of an omnibus list of state programs by June 30, 2009. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-06 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
2009-04-29 Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009
2009-03-17 Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-11 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0152 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback