TN HB0944 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, directs the commission to require all applicants for initial licensure, including but not limited to, a time-share license, to submit a complete and legible set of fingerprints to the commission or to the TBI for the purpose of obtaining a criminal background check from the TBI and the FBI. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, directs the commission to require all applicants for initial licensure, including but not limited to, a time-share license, to submit a complete and legible set of fingerprints to the commission or to the TBI for the purpose of obtaining a criminal background check from the TBI and the FBI. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Business and Utilities Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-22HouseComp. became Pub. Ch. 420
2013-04-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2013-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/2013
2013-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2013
2013-04-18HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2013
2013-04-18HouseRec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2013-04-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013
2013-04-10HousePlaced Behind the Budget
2013-04-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
2013-04-09HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2013
2013-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
2013-04-03HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2013-04-02HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2013-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/2/2013
2013-03-27HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
2013-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/27/2013
2013-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2013-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
2013-03-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/19/2013
2013-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
2013-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2013-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2013-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-02-05HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0942 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 420

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback