TN HB0941 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Action Def. in s/c Environment of CON to 3/31/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Action Def. in s/c Environment of CON to 3/31/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires department to give operator in charge or general manager of a public or private utility or municipality at least 24 hours notice prior to conducting an inspection, site visit, records review, sampling event, or other regulatory action. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221.
Title
As introduced, requires department to give operator in charge or general manager of a public or private utility or municipality at least 24 hours notice prior to conducting an inspection, site visit, records review, sampling event, or other regulatory action. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Environment of CON to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Environment of CON for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Environment of CON | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Conservation | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1335 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. E,C&T Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0941&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0941.pdf |