TN HB0932 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies the priority an employer, person, corporation, or institution must give to all orders of income assignment against an individual for child, medical, or spousal support; removes references to the Tennessee Judicial Council, which terminated June 30, 2009. - Amends TCA Section 36-5-406 and Section 36-5-501(j)(2)(A).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies the priority an employer, person, corporation, or institution must give to all orders of income assignment against an individual for child, medical, or spousal support; removes references to the Tennessee Judicial Council, which terminated June 30, 2009. - Amends TCA Section 36-5-406 and Section 36-5-501(j)(2)(A).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-07HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 2/27/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0788 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-15 - Enrolled and ready for signatures

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback