TN HB0931 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state treasurer to allocate 2 percent of the privilege tax revenue collected from sports gaming to urban and rural at-risk youth programs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 49 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 49 and Title 67, relative to revenues from sports gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/15/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee -- Finance, Ways, & Means Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0900 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee