TN HB0921 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes restriction on commercial advertising on school buses that requires such advertising to be composed of black lettering on a white background; prohibits advertisement of individual food items that, pursuant to law, cannot be sold via vending machines to students in pre-K through grade 8. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-2109(e).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, removes restriction on commercial advertising on school buses that requires such advertising to be composed of black lettering on a white background; prohibits advertisement of individual food items that, pursuant to law, cannot be sold via vending machines to students in pre-K through grade 8. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-2109(e).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-04 - House - K-12 OF ED: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-22 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 38
2009-03-26 Comp. SB subst.
2009-03-24 Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2009
2009-03-18 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/24/2009
2009-03-18 Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2009-03-11 Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/18/2009
2009-03-11 Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2009
2009-03-04 Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/11/2009
2009-03-04 Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
2009-02-26 Sponsor change.
2009-02-25 Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/04/2009
2009-02-25 Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to Education
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-11 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0073 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 38

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback