TN HB0917 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces sales taxes on food from 5.5 percent to 4 percent; provides that state share reimburse local governments for loss in food tax revenues. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, reduces sales taxes on food from 5.5 percent to 4 percent; provides that state share reimburse local governments for loss in food tax revenues. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Finance | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1224 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0917&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0917.pdf |