TN HB0912 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, designates the poem "My Tennessee," written by Michael McDonald in 1984, as an official state poem of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-303.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, designates the poem "My Tennessee," written by Michael McDonald in 1984, as an official state poem of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-303.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-10HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-08SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-08SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-04HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-04HousePassed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/19
2019-03-28HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0473 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-08 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback