TN HB0908 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases cash supplement for police officer in-service training from $600 to $1,200. - Amends TCA Section 38-8-111.
Title
As introduced, increases cash supplement for police officer in-service training from $600 to $1,200. - Amends TCA Section 38-8-111.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1478 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee