TN HB0896 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Arsenic Feeding Law." - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 2 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Arsenic Feeding Law." - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 2 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Agriculture | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Agriculture Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1635 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0896&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0896.pdf |