TN HB0873 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the offense for a person to distribute a small amount of marijuana not in excess of one-half ounce (14.175 grams); increases the amount of marijuana, from one-half ounce to one ounce, that a person must possess, casually exchange, or distribute to be considered a criminal offense punishable as a Class C misdemeanor by a $100 fine for each violation. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, deletes the offense for a person to distribute a small amount of marijuana not in excess of one-half ounce (14.175 grams); increases the amount of marijuana, from one-half ounce to one ounce, that a person must possess, casually exchange, or distribute to be considered a criminal offense punishable as a Class C misdemeanor by a $100 fine for each violation. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. David Shepard [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2016 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1211 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-30 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee