TN HB0841 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "K-12 Block Grant Act," which distributes block grants to each LEA to improve the quality of education; appropriates $250 million from excess state tax revenues over collected in fiscal years 2015-2016 and 2016-2017 for K-12 block grants. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "K-12 Block Grant Act," which distributes block grants to each LEA to improve the quality of education; appropriates $250 million from excess state tax revenues over collected in fiscal years 2015-2016 and 2016-2017 for K-12 block grants. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 56, Nays 30, PNV 1 |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0641) |
2017-05-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0631) |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0831 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-10 - Sponsor(s) Added.