TN HB0840 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, amends the requirements for what is to be included in a petition filed in juvenile court; clarifies the requirement that a court conducting a termination of parental rights hearing admit evidence pursuant to the Tennessee Rules of Evidence. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-113; Section 37-1-120; Section 37-1-129 and Section 37-1-183.
Title
As enacted, amends the requirements for what is to be included in a petition filed in juvenile court; clarifies the requirement that a court conducting a termination of parental rights hearing admit evidence pursuant to the Tennessee Rules of Evidence. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-113; Section 37-1-120; Section 37-1-129 and Section 37-1-183.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263 | |
2017-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1252 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 263