TN HB0839 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Wholesome Public School Learning Environment Act"; prohibits teachers or other employees of an LEA from discussing sexual preferences or drug use with a student of the LEA during school instruction or a school activity; prohibits an LEA from displaying symbols of drugs or drug paraphernalia on school grounds. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the Wholesome Public School Learning Environment Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0839&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB0839.pdf |