TN HB0814 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to direct each local board of education and charter school governing body to develop a plan to conduct mental and behavioral health screenings for all students in kindergarten through eighth grade in order to evaluate the impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on students' mental and behavioral health and any resulting learning loss. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0673 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee