TN HB0808 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows three or more sexual offenders to establish primary or secondary residence together if the property on which they live has been zoned for a use other than residential or mixed use by the appropriate local zoning laws. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, allows three or more sexual offenders to establish primary or secondary residence together if the property on which they live has been zoned for a use other than residential or mixed use by the appropriate local zoning laws. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 308 | |
2011-06-03 | Effective date(s) 05/27/11 | |
2011-05-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-16 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-16 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-13 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-12 | Passed S., Ayes 25, Nays 1 | |
2011-05-12 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-04-28 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-04-25 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-04-25 | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 9 | |
2011-04-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2011 | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1958 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 308