TN HB0806 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to report to the general assembly regarding the amount of money received pursuant to the Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to report to the general assembly regarding the amount of money received pursuant to the Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseRef. to Insurance Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-07HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0739 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/16/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback