TN HB0804 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on over-the-counter medicine, diapers, and feminine hygiene products; reduces sales and use tax rate on food and food ingredients by .5 percent each year beginning on January 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on over-the-counter medicine, diapers, and feminine hygiene products; reduces sales and use tax rate on food and food ingredients by .5 percent each year beginning on January 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0741 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-21 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation