TN HB0799 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, shortens the termination date for the polysomnographic professional standards committee, from June 30, 2016 to June 30, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 31.
Title
As introduced, shortens the termination date for the polysomnographic professional standards committee, from June 30, 2016 to June 30, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 31.
Sponsors
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0372 (Crossfiled) 2013-01-31 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0799&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0799.pdf |