TN HB0790 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a party's attorney to request a prehearing conference in any contested case that is set for a hearing. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5 and Title 23, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a party's attorney to request a prehearing conference in any contested case that is set for a hearing. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5 and Title 23, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1323 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0790&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0790.pdf |