TN HB0781 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides that a resolution adopted by a county or municipal legislative body on or after July 1, 2023, to exempt itself from the statewide building construction standards relative to one-family and two-family dwellings expires 150 days, instead of 180 days, following the date of the election for the local legislative body next occurring following the adoption of the resolution. - Amends TCA Section 68-120-101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 68-120-101, relative to building construction safety standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-15HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2023
2023-03-08HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2023-03-08HouseSponsor change.
2023-03-08HouseAction Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/15/2023
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2023
2023-02-22HouseAssigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
2023-02-22HouseRef. to Local Government Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0554 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback