TN HB0743 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lowers tax rate on retail sale of food from 5.5 percent to 5 percent. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, lowers tax rate on retail sale of food from 5.5 percent to 5 percent. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-05-11 | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0533 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-18 - Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/19/2011
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0743&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0743.pdf |