TN HB0741 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a summary suspension order of an adult day care's license to be reviewed by a hearing officer within seven calendar days instead of five working days. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, requires a summary suspension order of an adult day care's license to be reviewed by a hearing officer within seven calendar days instead of five working days. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0915 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0741&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0741.pdf |