TN HB0741 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Failed In s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Failed In s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for re-establishment of elected office of school superintendent for county or city school systems upon two-thirds vote of county or city governing body and approval in an election on the question by the voters; provides for qualifications of candidates; adjusts duties of the local board of education in county or city school systems electing superintendents. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, provides for re-establishment of elected office of school superintendent for county or city school systems upon two-thirds vote of county or city governing body and approval in an election on the question by the voters; provides for qualifications of candidates; adjusts duties of the local board of education in county or city school systems electing superintendents. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Failed In s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0916 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.