TN HB0739 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain executive branch officials and staff and the secretary of state, comptroller of the treasury, and the treasurer to file certain income disclosures. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Title
As introduced, requires certain executive branch officials and staff and the secretary of state, comptroller of the treasury, and the treasurer to file certain income disclosures. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Odom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1890 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0739&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0739.pdf |