TN HB0738 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Failed in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Failed in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires efficiency audits to be performed for public systems of higher education and public institutions of higher education; creates the joint higher education efficiency audit committee. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 12 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires efficiency audits to be performed for public systems of higher education and public institutions of higher education; creates the joint higher education efficiency audit committee. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 12 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Failed in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass with a neutral recommendation, ref. to Finance, Ways and Means |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-06 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/20/2018 |
2017-04-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0734 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee