TN HB0725 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of revenue to report, on or before February 1, 2024, to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives the total annual amount of industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credits provided for fiscal years 2021-2023. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0302 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee