TN HB0722 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts judges and chancellors from the professional privilege tax assessed to persons licensed as attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As introduced, exempts judges and chancellors from the professional privilege tax assessed to persons licensed as attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-21 | House | Reassigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-12 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/12/2020 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0992 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee