TN HB0721 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the administrative office of the courts to submit its annual report in an electronic format to the chair of the senate judiciary committee, the chair of the civil justice committee of the house of representatives, and the attorney general and reporter. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 20; Title 21; Title 24 and Title 28.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 20; Title 21; Title 24 and Title 28, relative to courts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2023-02-27HouseSponsor change.
2023-02-01HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-27HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0336 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback