TN HB0721 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, encourages department of human services to develop a partnership with minority and other community-based organizations to improve the health of racial and ethnic minorities and to extend public health legal services to minority and low-income individuals receiving social and medical services; requests department to utilize temporary assistance for needy families (TANF) funds to support such partnerships. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 16; Title 40; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 9; Title 16; Title 40; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to public health legal services.
Sponsors
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] |
Rep. Jason Hodges [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0308 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee