TN HB0708 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the early voting period when a presidential preference primary is held or an election is held at the same time as a presidential preference primary, to not more than 20 days nor less than seven days before the day of the election, instead of not more than 20 nor less than five days before the day of the election. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, changes the early voting period when a presidential preference primary is held or an election is held at the same time as a presidential preference primary, to not more than 20 days nor less than seven days before the day of the election, instead of not more than 20 nor less than five days before the day of the election. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381 | |
2011-05-21 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-21 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #5 for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-21 | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules | |
2011-05-19 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to last calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0923 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 381