TN HB0694 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires emergency communications districts (ECDs) to utilize the direct dispatch method in response to emergency 911 calls and one of three methods in response to non-emergency calls; requires that all emergency 911 calls, with the exception of misrouted calls, be dispatched without being transferred; authorizes ECDs to transfer non-emergency calls at the discretion of the dispatcher via attended transfer; adds emergency call takers and public safety dispatchers and emergency services personnel to definition of first responder for certain purposes. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 29; Title 39; Title 58 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 29; Title 39; Title 58 and Title 63, relative to emergency response.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0612 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee