TN HB0683 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to annually report on the availability and content of driver education and training courses in public schools to the education committees of the house of representatives and the senate. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of education to annually report on the availability and content of driver education and training courses in public schools to the education committees of the house of representatives and the senate. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1009 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee