TN HB0678 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1024
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1024
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, directs the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to study and make recommendations relative to the professional privilege tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As enacted, directs the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to study and make recommendations relative to the professional privilege tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1024 | |
2016-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Sales Tax Calendar |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2016 |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0556 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1024
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0678&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0678.pdf |