TN HB0668 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides civil immunity for the driver of an automobile who injures a protester who is blocking traffic in a public right-of-way if the driver was exercising due care. - Amends TCA Title 19; Title 20; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 54 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, provides civil immunity for the driver of an automobile who injures a protester who is blocking traffic in a public right-of-way if the driver was exercising due care. - Amends TCA Title 19; Title 20; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 54 and Title 55.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HouseFailed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseMeeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/17
2017-03-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-17HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0944 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback