TN HB0660 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the sale or purchase of previously titled antique or unique motor vehicles without a motor vehicle dealer license through auction formats that meet certain criteria. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17 and Title 62, Chapter 19.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 17 and Title 62, Chapter 19, relative to auctions of previously titled motor vehicles that are antique or unique.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Martin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Withdrawn. |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0416 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-28 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0660&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB0660.pdf |