TN HB0659 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires healthcare payors participating in an alternative payment system to disclose certain information to physicians; requires physicians to use best efforts not to disclose cost information to certain persons. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires healthcare payors participating in an alternative payment system to disclose certain information to physicians; requires physicians to use best efforts not to disclose cost information to certain persons. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-05-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1171 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means to first calendar of 2018