TN HB0657 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, permits dental hygienists to exercise prescriptive authority that is limited to fluoride agents, topical oral anesthetic agents, and nonsystemic oral antimicrobials under certain conditions; requires the board of dentistry to set educational and training requirements by rule; requires board to also determine allowable percentages of certain active ingredients in medications that may be prescribed by dental hygienists. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, permits dental hygienists to exercise prescriptive authority that is limited to fluoride agents, topical oral anesthetic agents, and nonsystemic oral antimicrobials under certain conditions; requires the board of dentistry to set educational and training requirements by rule; requires board to also determine allowable percentages of certain active ingredients in medications that may be prescribed by dental hygienists. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 319
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 05/08/2019; 07/01/2020
2019-05-08 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-29HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-23HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-23HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 92, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0657
2019-04-23HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/23/19
2019-04-22SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-22SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0307)
2019-04-22SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-17HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0182)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-08HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0609 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 319

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback