TN HB0649 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, vacates and reconstitutes commission; reduces number of members on commission to 13 voting members and four ex officio nonvoting members; revises qualifications for membership. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, vacates and reconstitutes commission; reduces number of members on commission to 13 voting members and four ex officio nonvoting members; revises qualifications for membership. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0483 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee