TN HB0619 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires an insurer to include cost sharing amounts paid by the enrollee, or on behalf of the enrollee by another person, when calculating an enrollee's contribution to an applicable cost sharing requirement, in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56, Chapter 7, relative to pharmacy benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 405
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-12 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-30HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-29HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 88, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0619
2021-04-28HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/29/21
2021-04-27SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-04-27SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0414)
2021-04-27SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-21HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-21HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
2021-04-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1397 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 405

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback